Former Minister of Finance
Mr.Srettha Thavisin
1 กันยายน พ.ศ. 2566 - 27 เมษายน พ.ศ. 2567
Mr.Arkhom Termpittayapaisith
October 1 ,2020 - Present
Mr.Preedee Daochai
August 8, 2020 - September 2, 2020
Mr.Uttama Savanayana
July 10, 2019 - July 9, 2020
Mr. Apisak Tantivorawong
August 19, 2015 - July 10, 2019
Mr. Sommai Phasee
August 31, 2014 - August 19, 2015
Mr. Kittiratt Na-Ranong
January 18, 2012 - May 7, 2014
Mr. Thirachai Phuvanatnaranubala
August 9, 2011 - January 18, 2012
Mr. Korn Chatikavanij
December 20, 2008 - May 10, 2011
Mr. Suchart Thada-Thamrongvech
September 24, 2008 - December 19, 2008
Mr. Surapong Suebwonglee
February 6, 2008 - September 23, 2008
Dr. Chalongphob Sussangkarn
March 7, 2007 - February 1, 2008
M.R. Pridiyathorn Devakula
October 8, 2006 - February 28, 2007
Dr. Thanong Bidaya
August 2, 2005 - September 19, 2006
June 21, 1997 - October 24, 1997
Captain Suchat Jaovisidha
February 8, 2003 - March 10, 2004
Dr. Somkid Jatusripitak
March 11, 2004 - August 2, 2005
March 10, 2003 - March 10, 2004
October 3, 2002 - February 8, 2003
February 17, 2001 - October 3, 2002
Mr. Tarrin Nimmanahaeminda
November 14, 1997 - February 16, 2001
September 28, 1992 - July 17, 1995
Mr. Kosit Panpiemras
October 24, 1997 - November 13, 1997
Dr. Amnuay Veeravan
November 29, 1996 - June 21, 1997
March 12, 1980 - March 11, 1981
Mr. Chaiwat Wiboonsawat
October 15, 1996 - November 28, 1996 (Acting)
Mr. Bodee Junnanon
May 28, 1996 - October 15, 1996
Dr. Surakiet Sathienthai
July 18, 1995 - May 28, 1996
Mr.Panat Simasathien
June 18, 1992 - September 27, 1992
Mr. Suthee Singsane
April 17, 1992 - June 17, 1992
March 6, 1991 - April 16, 1992
August 11, 1986 - August 8, 1988
Mr. Banharn Silpa-Archa
December 14, 1990 - February 23, 1991
Mr.Veerapong Ramangkul
August 26, 1990 - December 13, 1990
Mr.Pramual Sapavasu
August 9, 1988 - August 26, 1990
Mr. Sommai Huntakul
May 7, 1983 - August 11, 1986
March 11, 1981 - May 7, 1983
February 11, 1980 - March 11, 1980
May 30, 1974 - February 20, 1975
General Kriengsak Chommanan
May 24, 1979 - February 11, 1980
Mr.Supat Suthatham
November 12, 1977 - May 23, 1979
October 22, 1976 - November 11, 1977
Mr.Savetr Piempongsan
October 4, 1976 - October 21, 1976
April 21, 1976 - October 4, 1976
February 21, 1975 - March 16, 1975
Mr.Boonchu Rojanasathien
March 17, 1975 - April 20, 1976
Mr. Boonma Wongsawan
October 16, 1973 - May 29, 1974
Mr. Serm Vinitchaikun
December 19, 1972 - October 15, 1973
March 11, 1969 - December 17, 1972
July 8, 1965 - March 10, 1969
January 1, 1958 - October 20, 1958
September 26, 1957 - December 31, 1957
Mr. Sunthorn Hongladarom
December 11, 1963 - July 8, 1965
May 1, 1959 - December 10, 1963
Mr.Chort Kunakasem
February 10, 1955 - May 1, 1955
Mr. Prod Sarasin
September 23, 1953 - September 26, 1953
Colonel Varakarnbanch (Boonkert Sutantanon)
March 31, 1953 - September 16, 1953
General Pao Pienlert Boripanyuthakit
March 28, 1952 - March 30, 1953
December 8, 1951 - March 27, 1952
March 10, 1942 - August 1, 1944
December 17, 1941 - March 9, 1942
Major-General Luang Vijitrvathakarn (Vijitr Vijitrvathakarn)
November 29, 1951 - December 7, 1951
Pramanupanavimonsart (Chom Jamornman)
July 18, 1950 - November 28, 1951
Field Marshal Prak Pibulsongkam
October 13, 1949 - July 18, 1950
Prince Vivathanachai
June 28, 1949 - October 13, 1949
November 30, 1948 - June 27, 1949
February 25, 1948 - April 8, 1948
November 11, 1947 - February 24, 1948
Praya Tonavanikmontri (Visut Tonavanik)
April 15, 1948 - November 30, 1948
Mr.Vijitr Luritanon
May 31, 1947 - November 8, 1947
August 24, 1946 - May 30, 1947
Noble Luang Praditmanutham (Pridi Panomyong)
March 24, 1946 - August 23, 1946
December 20, 1938 - December 17, 1941
Praya Srivisaravaja (Tienlieng Huntakun)
February 2, 1946 - March 24, 1946
Mr.Direk Chainam
September 19, 1945 - February 1, 1946
September 1, 1945 - September 18, 1945
Mr. Leng Srisomwong
January 10, 1945 - August 31, 1945
Major Kuang Apaiwong
August 2 1944 - January 10, 1945
Praya Chaiyotsombat (Serm Kritsanamara)
December 21, 1937 - December 19, 1938
Auguat 10, 1937 - December 21,1937
February 12, 1936 August 9, 1937
General Praya Paholpolpayuhasena (Prod Paholyothin)
August 1, 1935 - February 12, 1936
Praya Manavarahchasevi (Prot Vichien of Songkra)
September 22, 1934 - August 1, 1935
Choapraya Srithammathibet (Jit Srithammathibet of Songkra)
December 16, 1933 - September 21, 1934
June 24, 1933 - December15, 1933
Praya Manopakornnitithada (Kon Hutasing)
December 10 1932 - June 23, 1933
June 29 1932 - December 10, 1932
Prince Supayokkasem
April 9, 1932 - June 29, 1932
January 17, 1922 - December 26, 1929
Praya Komankunramontri ( Chern Komankun of Nakorn)
April 1 1930 - April 9, 1932
October 26, 1929 - March 31 1930
Prince Prachantaburinarunah
April 1, 1908 - January 17, 1922
February 17, 1907 - March 31, 1907
Praya Suriyanuvat (Kert Boonak)
June 1, 1906 - February 17, 1907
Prince Mahisornratchaharuthai
August 26, 1896 - June 1, 1906
His Royal Highest Prince Srisithithongchai
December 23, 1894 - August 26, 1896
His Royal Highest Prince Praya Narisaranuvttiwong
March 21, 1892 - December 23, 1894
His Royal Highest Prince Jaturonratsami
1886 - 1892
His Royal Highest Prince Mahamala
1873 - 1886